There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Recognizing North Platte, Nebraska, as "Rail Town USA".


Actions Overview (2)

Date
09/18/2008Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR 9/17/2008 H8338)
07/31/2008Introduced in House

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
10/02/2008SenateReferred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
09/22/2008SenateReceived in the Senate.
09/18/2008-5:54pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/18/2008-5:54pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR 9/17/2008 H8338)
09/18/2008-5:54pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8454)
09/17/2008-4:16pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the chair put the question on the motion to suspend the rules. Mr. Graves objected to the vote on the grounds that a quorum was not present. Further proceedings on the motion were postponed. The point of no quorum was withdrawn.
09/17/2008-3:55pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 408.
09/17/2008-3:55pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8338-8341)
09/17/2008-3:54pmHouseMs. Brown, Corrine moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
08/01/2008HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
07/31/2008HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
07/31/2008HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Transportation and Infrastructure07/31/2008 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials08/01/2008 Referred to
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation10/02/2008 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.408.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for H.Con.Res.408. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (09/18/2008)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Recognizes North Platte, Nebraska, as "Rail Town USA."