Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed House without amendment (01/23/2007)

(This measure has not been amended since it was introduced. The summary of that version is repeated here.)

Provides for an adjournment of the House of Representatives from January 24, 2007, until January 29, 2007 (or until another time of reassembly under this concurrent resolution), and from January 31, 2007, until February 5, 2007 (or until another time of reassembly).

Authorizes the Speaker of the House or her designee, after consultation with the Minority Leader, to notify the Members of the House to reassemble at such place and time as she may designate whenever, in her opinion, the public interest shall warrant it.