Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6]* 09/11/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 09/11/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/15/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 09/15/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 09/16/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 09/16/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 09/17/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/17/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 09/18/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 09/18/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/18/2008
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/22/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 09/22/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/22/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 09/23/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 09/24/2008
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6] 09/26/2008