Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5]* 09/23/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 09/23/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/24/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 09/24/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 09/24/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 09/24/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/24/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 09/24/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 09/24/2008
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 09/24/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/24/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/24/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 09/26/2008
Rep. Edwards, Donna F. [D-MD-4] 09/26/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 09/26/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 09/27/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/27/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 09/27/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/27/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/27/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 09/27/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 09/27/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 09/29/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/29/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/29/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 09/29/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 09/29/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 09/29/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/03/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/03/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 10/03/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 10/03/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 10/03/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 10/03/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 11/19/2008