Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 09/26/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 09/26/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 09/26/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 09/26/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 09/29/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/02/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 10/02/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/19/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 11/19/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/19/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 11/19/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 11/20/2008