Summary: H.Con.Res.440 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Bill summaries are authored by CRS.

Shown Here:
Passed Senate amended (10/02/2008)

Declares that, when the House adjourns on any legislative day from Monday, September 29, 2008, through Friday, October 3, 2008, it stand adjourned until 11 a.m. on Saturday, January 3, 2009.

Declares that the Senate may recess or adjourn on any day from Thursday, October 2, 2008, through January 3, 2009, but not beyond 12 p.m. on Saturday, January 3, 2009.