Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 01/30/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 01/30/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 02/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/14/2007
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 02/27/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 03/19/2007