Text: H.Con.Res.46 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/29/2007)


110th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. CON. RES. 46


Declaring that it is the policy of the United States not to establish any military installation or base for the purpose of providing for the permanent stationing of United States Armed Forces in Iraq and not to exercise United States control of the oil resources of Iraq.


IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

January 29, 2007

Ms. Lee (for herself, Mr. Allen, Mr. Berman, Mr. Bishop of New York, Mr. Blumenauer, Mr. Brady of Pennsylvania, Mr. Capuano, Ms. Carson, Mr. Conyers, Mr. Crowley, Mr. DeFazio, Mr. Farr, Mr. Fattah, Mr. Frank of Massachusetts, Mr. Grijalva, Mr. Hare, Mr. Honda, Ms. Hooley, Ms. Jackson-Lee of Texas, Mr. Kucinich, Mrs. Maloney of New York, Ms. Matsui, Mr. McGovern, Mr. Meehan, Mr. Michaud, Ms. Moore of Wisconsin, Mr. Nadler, Mr. Price of North Carolina, Mr. Rothman, Ms. Schakowsky, Mr. Schiff, Ms. Schwartz, Mr. Stark, Mr. Waxman, and Ms. Woolsey) submitted the following concurrent resolution; which was referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned


CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Declaring that it is the policy of the United States not to establish any military installation or base for the purpose of providing for the permanent stationing of United States Armed Forces in Iraq and not to exercise United States control of the oil resources of Iraq.

    Whereas on April 13, 2004, President George W. Bush stated: “As a proud and independent people, Iraqis do not support an indefinite occupation and neither does America.”;

    Whereas on February 17, 2005, Secretary of Defense Donald Rumsfeld, testifying before the Committee on Armed Services of the Senate, stated: “We have no intention, at the present time, of putting permanent bases in Iraq.”;

    Whereas in January 2006 a University of Maryland Program on International Policy Attitudes poll found that even if the Government of Iraq asked the United States to withdraw its military forces in 6 months, 76 percent of Iraqis would assume the United States would refuse to do so;

    Whereas the perception that the United States intends to permanently occupy Iraq aids insurgent groups in recruiting supporters and fuels violent activity;

    Whereas a clear statement that the United States does not seek a long-term or permanent presence in Iraq would send a strong signal to the people of Iraq and the international community that the United States fully supports the efforts of the Iraqi people to exercise full national sovereignty, including control over security and public safety;

    Whereas the House of Representatives has passed four separate bills prohibiting the establishment of permanent military bases in Iraq using funds available for fiscal year 2007;

    Whereas President Bush codified the prohibition on the establishment of permanent military bases in Iraq using funds available for fiscal year 2007 by signing into law H.R. 5631 (“An Act making appropriations for the Department of Defense for the fiscal year ending September 30, 2007, and for other purposes”; Public Law 109–289) on September 29, 2006, and H.R. 5122 (the John Warner National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2007; Public Law 109–364) on October 17, 2006; and

    Whereas the Iraq Study Group Report recommends: “The President should state that the United States does not seek permanent military bases in Iraq. If the Iraqi government were to request a temporary base or bases, then the U.S. government could consider that request as it would in the case of any other government.”; and “The President should restate that the United States does not seek to control Iraq’s oil.”: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That the Congress declares that it is the policy of the United States—

(1) not to establish any military installation or base for the purpose of providing for the permanent stationing of United States Armed Forces in Iraq; and

(2) not to exercise United States control of the oil resources of Iraq.