Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/08/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 02/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 02/08/2007
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 02/08/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/08/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/08/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/08/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/08/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/08/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/08/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 02/08/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 02/08/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 02/08/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/08/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/08/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/08/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 02/13/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/13/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 02/13/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/13/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/13/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/16/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/16/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40] 02/16/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8] 02/16/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 02/16/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 03/01/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 03/01/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/01/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 03/01/2007
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 03/06/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/14/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/14/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/14/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/26/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 03/26/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 03/26/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 05/03/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/03/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 05/03/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 07/16/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 07/16/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/16/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 07/16/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/16/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/19/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/19/2007
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/23/2007