Text: H.Con.Res.49 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Referred in Senate (08/03/2007)


110th CONGRESS
1st Session
H. CON. RES. 49


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

July 31, 2007

Received

August 3, 2007

Referred to the Committee on Armed Services


CONCURRENT RESOLUTION

Recognizing the 75th anniversary of the Military Order of the Purple Heart and commending recipients of the Purple Heart for their courage and sacrifice on behalf of the United States.

    Whereas the Purple Heart is a combat decoration awarded to members of the Armed Forces who are wounded by an instrument of war wielded by the enemy and posthumously to the next of kin in the name of members who are killed in action or die of wounds received in action;

    Whereas the Purple Heart was originally conceived as the Badge of Military Merit by General George Washington on August 7, 1782;

    Whereas 2007 marks the 225th anniversary of the Badge of Military Merit, the predecessor of the Purple Heart Medal;

    Whereas the practice of awarding the Purple Heart was revived in 1932, the 200th anniversary of George Washington’s birth, out of respect for his memory and military achievements;

    Whereas over 1.5 million Purple Heart Medals have been awarded to members of the Armed Forces fighting in defense of freedom and democracy in the Civil War, the Spanish-American War, World War I, World War II, the Korean War, the Vietnam War, Somalia, Bosnia, Operation Desert Storm, Operation Enduring Freedom, Operation Iraqi Freedom, and other expeditionary conflicts;

    Whereas the organization known as the Military Order of the Purple Heart was formed on October 19, 1932, for the protection and mutual interest of members of the Armed Forces who have received the Purple Heart; and

    Whereas the Military Order of the Purple Heart is composed exclusively of recipients of the Purple Heart: Now, therefore, be it

Resolved by the House of Representatives (the Senate concurring), That Congress—

(1) congratulates the Military Order of the Purple Heart on its 75th anniversary as a national organization whose goals are to preserve and sustain the honor of the Armed Forces;

(2) commends all recipients of the Purple Heart for their courage and sacrifice on behalf of the United States; and

(3) encourages all Americans to take time to learn about the Purple Heart and the honor, courage, and bravery it symbolizes.

Passed the House of Representatives July 30, 2007.

    Attest: lorraine c. miller,   
    Clerk.