Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1]* 01/31/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 02/12/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 02/12/2007
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 02/12/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/16/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 03/07/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/07/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 03/07/2007
Rep. Lungren, Daniel E. [R-CA-3] 03/07/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 03/07/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 03/07/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/07/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 03/07/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 03/07/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/07/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/07/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 03/07/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/07/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/08/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 05/21/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/14/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/14/2007