Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 01/11/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/11/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/16/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 01/16/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 01/16/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/23/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 01/29/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/29/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 01/30/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/29/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/29/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/29/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/29/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/29/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 03/29/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/29/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/29/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/29/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/29/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/29/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/29/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 03/29/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/29/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 03/29/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 03/29/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 03/29/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 03/29/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/17/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/17/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/17/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/17/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8] 04/17/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/18/2007
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 04/19/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/19/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 04/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/19/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/19/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 04/19/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/19/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/19/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 04/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 04/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/23/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/23/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 04/23/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 04/23/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/23/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/24/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 04/24/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/24/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/24/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 04/24/2007