Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 02/27/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 02/27/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 03/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 03/05/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/05/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/06/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/08/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/08/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/08/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 03/09/2007
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/09/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/12/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/12/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/12/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/14/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 03/14/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 03/15/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 03/15/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/19/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/20/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/20/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/21/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 03/23/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/27/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/16/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/16/2007
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/16/2007