Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/16/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/16/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 02/16/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/01/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/23/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/23/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/23/2007
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/23/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 03/23/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/23/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 03/23/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/23/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/23/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/23/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/23/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 03/23/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 03/29/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/29/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/29/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 03/29/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 03/29/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 04/16/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/16/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 04/16/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/16/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 04/26/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/26/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 04/26/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/26/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/26/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/26/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15] 04/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/26/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 05/08/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/08/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/08/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/25/2008