Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 03/06/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 03/06/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/12/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 03/12/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 03/12/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 03/21/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 04/19/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 06/25/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 08/03/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 09/17/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 09/17/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/18/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 09/18/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 09/19/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 09/19/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 09/24/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 09/25/2007