Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 03/08/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/08/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/08/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/19/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/19/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/19/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/19/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 03/19/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 03/19/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 03/26/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 03/26/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/26/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/26/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/26/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 05/07/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/07/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Israel, Steve [D-NY-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/07/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 05/07/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/07/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/07/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 05/07/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 05/07/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/07/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 05/07/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/07/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/07/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 05/10/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/24/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/24/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 06/07/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/10/2007