Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/05/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/05/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 01/09/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/09/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 01/09/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 01/09/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 01/09/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/09/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/09/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 01/09/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/10/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 01/10/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/10/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/10/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 01/10/2007
Rep. Mitchell, Harry E. [D-AZ-5] 01/10/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 01/10/2007
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 01/10/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/10/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5] 01/11/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/11/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/11/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/16/2007
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 01/16/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 01/16/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/18/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/18/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 01/29/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 01/30/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/31/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 01/31/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 02/13/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/27/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 02/27/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 02/27/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/28/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 02/28/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/28/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/28/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/28/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/28/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/01/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/01/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/01/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/01/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/01/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/01/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/01/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 03/01/2007
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8] 03/01/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 03/01/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/01/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/01/2007
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 03/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/07/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 03/09/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/09/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 03/09/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/09/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 03/09/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/09/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24] 03/09/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/14/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 03/14/2007