Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 03/13/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/13/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 03/13/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30]* 03/13/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 03/13/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 03/27/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/02/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/14/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 06/26/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/11/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/11/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/11/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 03/11/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/11/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/11/2008