Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/30/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/30/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/30/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/30/2007
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 04/19/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/01/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 05/23/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/23/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 05/23/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/24/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/05/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/05/2007
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 06/05/2007