Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachmann, Michele [R-MN-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Campbell, John [R-CA-48]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Jo Ann [R-VA-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hensarling, Jeb [R-TX-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49]* 01/04/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Mack, Connie [R-FL-14]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-42]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Neugebauer, Randy [R-TX-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Rehberg, Dennis R. [R-MT-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-40]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Adrian [R-NE-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Flake, Jeff [R-AZ-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-3]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 01/04/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 01/05/2007
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/05/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/05/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 01/05/2007
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 01/10/2007
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 01/10/2007
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 01/10/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 01/10/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 01/10/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 01/10/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 01/10/2007
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 01/10/2007
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 01/10/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/10/2007
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 01/11/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 01/18/2007
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 01/18/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/18/2007
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 01/18/2007
Rep. Pearce, Stevan [R-NM-2] 01/18/2007
Rep. Poe, Ted [R-TX-2] 01/18/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 01/18/2007
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 01/18/2007
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 01/18/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 01/18/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 01/24/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 01/24/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 02/05/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 02/05/2007
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 02/05/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/05/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 02/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 02/13/2007
Rep. Kline, John [R-MN-2] 02/13/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/13/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/13/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/13/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/13/2007
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 02/13/2007
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 03/21/2007
Rep. Herseth, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 03/21/2007
Rep. Lamborn, Doug [R-CO-5] 02/13/2008
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 03/14/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/08/2008