Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 01/16/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 01/16/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/16/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4] 01/16/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 01/16/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/16/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/16/2007
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 01/16/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/16/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 01/16/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 01/16/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 01/18/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 01/23/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/23/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/23/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/24/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/24/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 01/24/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/30/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/31/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 02/06/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 02/06/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 02/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 02/13/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/13/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 02/13/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 02/16/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/16/2007
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 02/16/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/01/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 03/01/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/01/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 03/01/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/01/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/01/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/01/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/06/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/06/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/06/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/06/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/09/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 03/14/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 04/17/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 04/23/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/23/2007
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/03/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/22/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 09/07/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 12/04/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 12/18/2007