Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 01/16/2007
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 01/16/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 01/16/2007
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 01/16/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 01/18/2007
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/29/2007
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 01/29/2007
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 02/05/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 12/12/2007
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 12/17/2007