Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/31/2007
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 02/07/2007
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-7] 04/26/2007
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 08/01/2007