Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3]* 01/17/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 01/18/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 01/18/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 01/18/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 01/18/2007
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/18/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/22/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 01/22/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 01/24/2007
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 01/30/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 01/30/2007
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19] 02/06/2007
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 02/15/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/16/2007
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 04/18/2007