Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/06/2007
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Rogers, Mike D. [R-AL-3]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/06/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/06/2007
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 02/12/2007
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 02/15/2007
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [R-VA-5] 06/15/2007
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24] 03/03/2008
Rep. Broun, Paul C. [R-GA-10] 05/21/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 06/11/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7] 06/11/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 06/11/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 06/11/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5] 06/11/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 06/11/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 06/11/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/11/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/11/2008
Rep. Davis, David [R-TN-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 06/25/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 06/25/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 06/25/2008
Rep. Gohmert, Louie [R-TX-1] 06/25/2008
Rep. Westmoreland, Lynn A. [R-GA-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 06/25/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 06/25/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 06/25/2008
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 06/25/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 06/25/2008
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/15/2008
Rep. Carter, John R. [R-TX-31] 09/18/2008