Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/13/2007
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/17/2007
Rep. Davis, Artur [D-AL-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17] 06/11/2007
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/11/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/11/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/11/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/11/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-7] 06/11/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 06/11/2007
Rep. Green, Al [D-TX-9] 06/11/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/11/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/11/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/11/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/11/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/11/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/11/2007
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/11/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/12/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 07/12/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/12/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 07/12/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 07/12/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 07/12/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/12/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/19/2007
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/19/2007
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/19/2007
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 07/19/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/19/2007
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 07/19/2007
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 07/27/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/27/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/20/2007
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/20/2007