Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-15]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/05/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Ryan, Tim [D-OH-17]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Arcuri, Michael A. [D-NY-24]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10]* 03/05/2007
Rep. Murphy, Christopher S. [D-CT-5]* 03/05/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/26/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/26/2007
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/26/2007
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/27/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/19/2007
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 07/19/2007
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/05/2008
Rep. Sarbanes, John P. [D-MD-3] 04/29/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/30/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 05/06/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/08/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/13/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 05/20/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/20/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/04/2008
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 06/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 06/19/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 06/23/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 06/26/2008
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 07/08/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/08/2008
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 07/14/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/14/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 07/29/2008