Text: H.J.Res.44 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 110-52 (08/01/2007)

 
[110th Congress Public Law 52]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


[DOCID: f:publ052.110]

[[Page 121 STAT. 264]]

Public Law 110-52
110th Congress

                            Joint Resolution


 
 Approving the renewal of import restrictions contained in the Burmese 
Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003, and for other purposes. <<NOTE: Aug. 
                      1, 2007 -  [H.J. Res. 44]>> 

    Resolved by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United 
States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. RENEWAL <<NOTE: 50 USC 1701 note.>> OF IMPORT RESTRICTIONS 
            UNDER BURMESE FREEDOM AND DEMOCRACY ACT OF 2003.

    Congress approves the renewal of import restrictions contained in 
section 3(a)(1) of the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 2003.

SEC. 2. MERCHANDISE PROCESSING FEES.

    Section 13031(j)(3)(A) of the Consolidated Omnibus Budget 
Reconciliation Act of 1985 (19 U.S.C. 58c(j)(3)(A)) is amended by 
striking ``October 14, 2014'' and inserting ``October 21, 2014''.

SEC. 3. TIME FOR PAYMENT OF CORPORATE ESTIMATED TAXES.

    Subparagraph (B) of section 401(1) of the Tax Increase Prevention 
and Reconciliation Act of 2005 <<NOTE: 26 USC 6655 note.>> is amended by 
striking ``114.50 percent'' and inserting ``114.75 percent''.

SEC. 4. <<NOTE: 50 USC 1701 note.>> RULE OF <<NOTE: 19 USC 58c 
            note.>> CONSTRUCTION.

    This joint resolution shall be deemed to be a ``renewal resolution'' 
for purposes of section 9 of the Burmese Freedom and Democracy Act of 
2003.

[[Page 121 STAT. 265]]

SEC. 5. EFFECTIVE <<NOTE: 19 USC 58c note.>> DATE.

    This joint resolution and the amendments made by this joint 
resolution shall take effect on the date of the enactment of this joint 
resolution or July 26, 2007, whichever occurs first.

    Approved August 1, 2007.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.J. Res. 44:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 153 (2007):
            July 23, considered and passed House.
            July 24, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>