Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Lincoln [D-TN-4]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Murphy, Patrick J. [D-PA-8]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-4]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6]* 06/12/2007
Rep. Donnelly, Joe [D-IN-2] 06/28/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 07/17/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/20/2007
Rep. Childers, Travis [D-MS-1] 06/17/2008