Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/03/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/03/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 10/17/2007
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 11/01/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 12/04/2007
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/13/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/02/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3] 04/02/2008