Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8]* 09/27/2007
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 10/04/2007
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/04/2007
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 10/04/2007
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 10/04/2007
Rep. Walberg, Timothy [R-MI-7] 10/04/2007
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 10/12/2007
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 10/12/2007
Rep. Buchanan, Vern [R-FL-13] 10/12/2007
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 10/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 10/12/2007
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 10/12/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 10/12/2007
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 10/12/2007
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/12/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 10/12/2007
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3] 10/12/2007
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 10/16/2007
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/16/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 10/16/2007
Rep. Gerlach, Jim [R-PA-6] 10/17/2007
Rep. Bilirakis, Gus M. [R-FL-9] 10/17/2007
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 10/17/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 10/17/2007
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 10/18/2007
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 10/18/2007
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 10/23/2007
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 10/23/2007
Rep. Heller, Dean [R-NV-2] 10/23/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/23/2007
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 10/24/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/24/2007
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 10/24/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/30/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/30/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 10/30/2007
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 10/30/2007
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-24] 10/30/2007
Rep. Forbes, J. Randy [R-VA-4] 10/30/2007
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/30/2007
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 11/01/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/01/2007
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8] 11/01/2007
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 11/01/2007
Rep. Roskam, Peter J. [R-IL-6] 11/01/2007
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 11/01/2007
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 11/01/2007
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 11/06/2007
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 11/06/2007
Rep. Culberson, John Abney [R-TX-7] 11/06/2007
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 11/06/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/06/2007
Rep. Price, Tom [R-GA-6] 11/07/2007
Rep. McCaul, Michael T. [R-TX-10] 11/07/2007
Rep. Brown, Henry E., Jr. [R-SC-1] 11/13/2007
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5] 11/13/2007
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 11/13/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 11/13/2007
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 11/13/2007
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-22] 11/13/2007
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/13/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 11/14/2007
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 11/14/2007
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 11/14/2007
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 11/15/2007
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 11/15/2007
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 11/15/2007
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 12/05/2007
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 12/05/2007
Rep. Melancon, Charlie [D-LA-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-3] 12/05/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 12/05/2007
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 12/06/2007
Rep. Gingrey, Phil [R-GA-11] 12/06/2007
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 12/06/2007
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 12/06/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 12/06/2007
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 12/11/2007
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 12/11/2007
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 12/11/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 12/12/2007
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 12/12/2007
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 12/19/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 12/19/2007
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 12/19/2007
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 12/19/2007
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 12/19/2007
Rep. Dent, Charles W. [R-PA-15] 01/17/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 01/17/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/17/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 01/17/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 01/17/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 02/07/2008