Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 12/11/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18]* 12/11/2007
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 12/11/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 12/12/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 02/27/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/27/2008
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 02/27/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 02/27/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/13/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/31/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/03/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/15/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 07/22/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 10/03/2008