Refine your search

Showing 6 of 6 total for Major Actions.
Date Major Actions
04/23/2008 Became Public Law No: 110-203.
04/23/2008 Signed by President.
04/22/2008 Presented to President.
04/14/2008 Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2982)
04/08/2008 Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the resolution, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 393 - 0 (Roll no. 161).(text: CR H2022)
12/13/2007 Introduced in House