Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Altmire, Jason [D-PA-4]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 01/15/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Ferguson, Mike [R-NJ-7]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Hall, John J. [D-NY-19]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Kagen, Steve [D-WI-8]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 01/15/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 01/18/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 01/18/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 01/18/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 01/18/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/18/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 01/18/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1] 01/18/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 01/18/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 01/18/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 01/18/2008
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 01/18/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/18/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 01/18/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 01/18/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/18/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 01/18/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 01/18/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 01/18/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 01/18/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/18/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 01/18/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 01/18/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 01/18/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 01/18/2008
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/18/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 01/18/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 01/18/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 01/18/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 01/18/2008
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 01/18/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 01/18/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 01/18/2008
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 01/18/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 01/18/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 01/18/2008
Rep. Rogers, Mike J. [R-MI-8] 01/18/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 01/18/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 01/18/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 01/18/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 01/18/2008
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 01/18/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 01/18/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 01/18/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 01/18/2008
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 01/18/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 01/22/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 01/22/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 01/23/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 01/28/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 02/06/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/07/2008