Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Reichert, David G. [R-WA-8]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/13/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/03/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/03/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/29/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14] 05/07/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/07/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 05/07/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 05/07/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 05/14/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/14/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 05/21/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 05/22/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/03/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 06/04/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/05/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 06/05/2008
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 06/09/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/17/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 06/19/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 06/19/2008
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/24/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/24/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 06/24/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/26/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/09/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 07/09/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 07/09/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 07/09/2008
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/09/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/15/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 07/15/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 07/16/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 07/16/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 07/24/2008
Rep. Courtney, Joe [D-CT-2] 07/29/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 07/29/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 07/29/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 09/09/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/09/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/09/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 09/09/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 09/09/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/11/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 09/18/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 09/23/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 09/23/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/24/2008