Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/26/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/26/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/09/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/23/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/02/2008