Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 06/05/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/09/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/09/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/09/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 06/12/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/12/2008
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-46] 06/12/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/12/2008
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/18/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 06/18/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/18/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/20/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 07/08/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 07/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/10/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 07/10/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 07/10/2008
Rep. Welch, Peter [D-VT-At Large] 07/10/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 07/10/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/10/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 07/14/2008
Rep. Langevin, James R. [D-RI-2] 07/21/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/21/2008