Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Keller, Ric [R-FL-8]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 06/26/2008
Rep. Jordan, Jim [R-OH-4] 07/08/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 07/08/2008
Rep. Burgess, Michael C. [R-TX-26] 07/08/2008
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 07/09/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/09/2008
Rep. Scalise, Steve [R-LA-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. Bishop, Rob [R-UT-1] 07/17/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 07/17/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 07/17/2008
Rep. Barrett, J. Gresham [R-SC-3] 07/17/2008
Rep. Latta, Robert E. [R-OH-5] 07/17/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 07/23/2008