Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 01/24/2007
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 01/24/2007
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/31/2007
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 01/31/2007
Rep. Fortuno, Luis G. [R-PR-At Large] 01/31/2007
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 01/31/2007
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 01/31/2007
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 01/31/2007
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 01/31/2007
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 01/31/2007
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 01/31/2007
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 01/31/2007
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 01/31/2007
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 01/31/2007
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 01/31/2007
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 02/05/2007
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 02/05/2007
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 02/05/2007
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 02/05/2007
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 02/06/2007
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 02/06/2007
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 02/06/2007
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/06/2007
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/06/2007
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43] 02/06/2007
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 02/06/2007
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 02/06/2007
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 02/08/2007
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/08/2007
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 02/08/2007
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 02/13/2007
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 02/13/2007
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 02/13/2007
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/13/2007
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 02/13/2007
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 02/13/2007
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/13/2007
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/13/2007
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 02/13/2007
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 02/15/2007
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/15/2007
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/15/2007
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 02/15/2007
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 02/15/2007
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 02/27/2007
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 02/27/2007
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 02/27/2007
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 02/27/2007
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 02/27/2007
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 02/27/2007
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Lipinski, Daniel [D-IL-3] 02/27/2007
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 02/27/2007
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 02/27/2007
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/05/2007
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/05/2007
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/05/2007
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/05/2007
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2007
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/05/2007
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/05/2007
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 03/09/2007
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/09/2007
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/09/2007
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/15/2007
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/15/2007
Rep. Jindal, Bobby [R-LA-1] 03/22/2007
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/26/2007
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/29/2007
Rep. Carney, Christopher P. [D-PA-10] 03/29/2007
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/17/2007
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 04/17/2007
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/17/2007
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 04/17/2007
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 04/17/2007
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 04/17/2007
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 04/17/2007
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/19/2007
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 04/19/2007
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 04/24/2007
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/24/2007
Rep. Yarmuth, John A. [D-KY-3] 04/26/2007
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/01/2007
Rep. Lynch, Stephen F. [D-MA-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/01/2007
Rep. Meek, Kendrick B. [D-FL-17] 05/01/2007