Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 02/26/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-14]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5]* 02/26/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 02/26/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 02/26/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/26/2008
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 02/26/2008
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-25] 03/03/2008
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 04/02/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/02/2008
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/02/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Hodes, Paul W. [D-NH-2] 04/02/2008
Rep. Walz, Timothy J. [D-MN-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Klein, Ron [D-FL-22] 04/17/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/17/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/17/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 04/17/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/17/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/17/2008
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/17/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 04/17/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 04/17/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/17/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/17/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23] 05/01/2008
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 05/06/2008
Rep. Ruppersberger, C. A. Dutch [D-MD-2] 05/06/2008