Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8]* 02/27/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/05/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cooper, Jim [D-TN-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Emanuel, Rahm [D-IL-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 03/10/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bonner, Jo [R-AL-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Alexander, Rodney [R-LA-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Marchant, Kenny [R-TX-24] 03/10/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-26] 03/10/2008
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Boozman, John [R-AR-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Issa, Darrell E. [R-CA-49] 03/10/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Mario [R-FL-25] 03/10/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 03/10/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Miller, Jeff [R-FL-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 03/10/2008
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/10/2008
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/10/2008
Rep. Crenshaw, Ander [R-FL-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/10/2008
Rep. Garrett, Scott [R-NJ-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 03/10/2008
Rep. Boustany, Charles W., Jr. [R-LA-7] 03/10/2008
Rep. Fortenberry, Jeff [R-NE-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/10/2008
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Renzi, Rick [R-AZ-1] 03/10/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Cole, Tom [R-OK-4] 03/10/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 03/12/2008
Rep. Wittman, Robert J. [R-VA-1] 03/14/2008