Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 03/13/2008
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-3] 06/20/2008
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-17] 06/25/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/25/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. Murphy, Tim [R-PA-18] 06/25/2008
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 06/25/2008
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/25/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/26/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 06/26/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 07/08/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/08/2008
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/09/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 07/10/2008