Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Wilson, Joe [R-SC-2]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Cantor, Eric [R-VA-7]* 02/28/2008
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 03/04/2008
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/04/2008
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-5] 03/04/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/04/2008
Rep. McCotter, Thaddeus G. [R-MI-11] 03/04/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/04/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/04/2008
Rep. Pence, Mike [R-IN-6] 03/04/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/05/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 03/06/2008
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 03/11/2008
Rep. Higgins, Brian [D-NY-27] 03/11/2008
Rep. Bishop, Timothy H. [D-NY-1] 03/11/2008
Rep. Inglis, Bob [R-SC-4] 03/12/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/01/2008
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/02/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 04/02/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 04/02/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 04/09/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 04/09/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 04/10/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 04/14/2008
Rep. Marshall, Jim [D-GA-8] 04/14/2008
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 04/15/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/17/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/17/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 04/23/2008
Rep. Platts, Todd Russell [R-PA-19] 04/23/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/29/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/05/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 05/13/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/19/2008
Rep. Franks, Trent [R-AZ-2] 05/20/2008
Rep. Foster, Bill [D-IL-14] 05/20/2008
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/21/2008
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 05/21/2008
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-50] 05/21/2008
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/03/2008
Rep. Porter, Jon C. [R-NV-3] 06/03/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 06/05/2008
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/10/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 06/10/2008
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/18/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 06/23/2008
Rep. Kuhl, John R. "Randy", Jr. [R-NY-29] 06/26/2008
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/14/2008
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 07/14/2008