Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Feeney, Tom [R-FL-24]* 02/28/2008
Rep. Chandler, Ben [D-KY-6] 05/14/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/14/2008
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/14/2008
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/14/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/15/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/15/2008
Rep. Ellsworth, Brad [D-IN-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Wilson, Charles A. [D-OH-6] 05/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/15/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4] 05/20/2008
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/20/2008
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/20/2008
Rep. Conaway, K. Michael [R-TX-11] 05/20/2008
Rep. Shuster, Bill [R-PA-9] 05/20/2008
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/20/2008
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-32] 05/20/2008
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-3] 05/20/2008
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/22/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Mahoney, Tim [D-FL-16] 05/22/2008
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-9] 05/22/2008
Rep. Putnam, Adam H. [R-FL-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Tiberi, Patrick J. [R-OH-12] 05/22/2008
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-44] 05/22/2008
Rep. Space, Zachary T. [D-OH-18] 05/22/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/22/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/22/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/22/2008
Rep. McHenry, Patrick T. [R-NC-10] 05/22/2008
Rep. Miller, Brad [D-NC-13] 06/04/2008
Rep. Ross, Mike [D-AR-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Boren, Dan [D-OK-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sullivan, John [R-OK-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Geoff [R-KY-4] 06/04/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 06/04/2008
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/04/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 06/04/2008
Rep. Sali, Bill [R-ID-1] 06/09/2008