Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/03/2008
Rep. Graves, Sam [R-MO-6]* 03/03/2008
Rep. Akin, W. Todd [R-MO-2]* 03/03/2008
Rep. Carnahan, Russ [D-MO-3]* 03/03/2008
Rep. Cleaver, Emanuel [D-MO-5]* 03/03/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1]* 03/03/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/03/2008
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/04/2008
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-4] 04/30/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. King, Steve [R-IA-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. Loebsack, David [D-IA-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/20/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 06/03/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/11/2008
Rep. Johnson, Timothy V. [R-IL-15] 06/26/2008
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-19] 07/08/2008
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/21/2008