Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/05/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/11/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/14/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/14/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/31/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/31/2008
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/31/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/31/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/08/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/08/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 04/14/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 04/22/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/23/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/30/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/06/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 05/13/2008
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/13/2008
Rep. Carson, Andre [D-IN-7] 05/14/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/19/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 06/11/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 06/11/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/19/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 06/19/2008
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/19/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 07/14/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/23/2008