Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-23]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53]* 03/04/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/04/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29]* 03/04/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39]* 03/04/2008
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/04/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/05/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 03/05/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/05/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/05/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/05/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/05/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/05/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 03/05/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large] 03/05/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/05/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 03/05/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 03/05/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/05/2008
Rep. Ellison, Keith [D-MN-5] 03/05/2008
Rep. Michaud, Michael H. [D-ME-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/06/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 03/06/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 03/06/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 03/06/2008
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-27] 03/06/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 03/06/2008
Rep. McNerney, Jerry [D-CA-11] 03/06/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 03/06/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 03/06/2008
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/06/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/06/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/06/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/06/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 03/06/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/06/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/06/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/06/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 03/06/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 03/10/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 03/10/2008
Rep. Kirk, Mark Steven [R-IL-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 03/12/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/12/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/31/2008
Rep. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD-8] 03/31/2008