Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McMorris Rodgers, Cathy [R-WA-5]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Brown-Waite, Ginny [R-FL-5]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/05/2008
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/05/2008
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Matsui, Doris O. [D-CA-5]* 03/05/2008
Rep. McCollum, Betty [D-MN-4]* 03/05/2008
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Moore, Gwen [D-WI-4]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32]* 03/05/2008
Rep. Fallin, Mary [R-OK-5] 03/10/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 03/10/2008
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-17] 03/10/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/10/2008
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/31/2008
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/31/2008
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/31/2008
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 04/08/2008
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/08/2008
Rep. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI-2] 04/08/2008
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/08/2008
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/09/2008
Rep. Davis, Susan A. [D-CA-53] 04/09/2008
Rep. Watson, Diane E. [D-CA-33] 04/09/2008
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-28] 04/09/2008
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/09/2008
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-38] 04/09/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 04/09/2008
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 04/09/2008
Rep. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY-20] 04/09/2008
Rep. Tsongas, Niki [D-MA-5] 04/09/2008
Rep. Harman, Jane [D-CA-36] 04/09/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 04/09/2008
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 04/09/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Linda T. [D-CA-39] 04/09/2008
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-47] 04/09/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11] 04/09/2008
Rep. Schiff, Adam B. [D-CA-29] 04/14/2008
Rep. Wasserman Schultz, Debbie [D-FL-20] 04/16/2008
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/23/2008
Rep. Herseth Sandlin, Stephanie [D-SD-At Large] 04/23/2008
Rep. Schwartz, Allyson Y. [D-PA-13] 04/23/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7] 04/23/2008
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/24/2008
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 04/29/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22] 04/29/2008
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/01/2008
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/01/2008
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 05/01/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/01/2008
Rep. Scott, David [D-GA-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13] 05/01/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/01/2008
Rep. Braley, Bruce L. [D-IA-1] 05/01/2008
Rep. Johnson, Henry C. "Hank," Jr. [D-GA-4] 05/01/2008
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-30] 05/05/2008
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 05/05/2008
Rep. Sutton, Betty [D-OH-13] 05/05/2008
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/05/2008
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/06/2008
Rep. Boyda, Nancy E. [D-KS-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV-2] 05/06/2008
Rep. Castor, Kathy [D-FL-11] 05/06/2008
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. Giffords, Gabrielle [D-AZ-8] 05/06/2008
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/06/2008
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/06/2008
Rep. Richardson, Laura [D-CA-37] 05/06/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34] 05/06/2008
Rep. Shea-Porter, Carol [D-NH-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/06/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/06/2008
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/06/2008
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/06/2008
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/06/2008
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/06/2008
Rep. Barrow, John [D-GA-12] 05/07/2008
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/07/2008
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/07/2008
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [R-TX-4] 05/07/2008
Rep. Hare, Phil [D-IL-17] 05/07/2008
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-5] 05/07/2008
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-14] 05/07/2008
Rep. Matheson, Jim [D-UT-2] 05/07/2008
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/07/2008
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/07/2008
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/07/2008
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 05/08/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. Drake, Thelma D. [R-VA-2] 05/08/2008
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 05/08/2008
Rep. Speier, Jackie [D-CA-12] 05/08/2008
Rep. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN-7] 05/08/2008
Rep. Miller, Candice S. [R-MI-10] 05/08/2008
Rep. Musgrave, Marilyn N. [R-CO-4] 05/08/2008
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 05/08/2008
Rep. Foxx, Virginia [R-NC-5] 05/08/2008
Rep. Bean, Melissa L. [D-IL-8] 05/08/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/08/2008
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/14/2008
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/14/2008
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/15/2008
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/19/2008