Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-43]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Christensen, Donna M. [D-VI-At Large]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Grijalva, Raul M. [D-AZ-7]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Salazar, John T. [D-CO-3]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-34]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Butterfield, G. K. [D-NC-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-13]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-22]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Clarke, Yvette D. [D-NY-11]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Sires, Albio [D-NJ-13]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/06/2008
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-45] 03/11/2008
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 03/11/2008
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-4] 03/11/2008
Rep. Schmidt, Jean [R-OH-2] 03/11/2008
Rep. Sestak, Joe [D-PA-7] 03/11/2008
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-23] 03/11/2008
Rep. Solis, Hilda L. [D-CA-32] 03/11/2008
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 04/08/2008
Rep. Clay, Wm. Lacy [D-MO-1] 04/08/2008
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 04/08/2008
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-51] 04/08/2008
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/08/2008
Rep. Bordallo, Madeleine Z. [D-GU-At Large] 04/10/2008
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/10/2008
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cohen, Steve [D-TN-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/10/2008
Rep. Shuler, Heath [D-NC-11] 04/10/2008
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/10/2008
Rep. Honda, Michael M. [D-CA-15] 04/10/2008
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 04/10/2008
Rep. Cardoza, Dennis A. [D-CA-18] 04/10/2008
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-31] 04/10/2008
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-23] 04/10/2008
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-26] 04/10/2008
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 04/10/2008
Rep. Costa, Jim [D-CA-20] 04/10/2008
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 04/23/2008