Text: H.Res.1044 — 110th Congress (2007-2008)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (03/12/2008)

 
[Congressional Bills 110th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H. Res. 1044 Introduced in House (IH)]







110th CONGRESS
  2d Session
H. RES. 1044

 Condemning the dismissal of the Supreme Court in Pakistan and calling 
         for their reinstatement by the Government of Pakistan.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             March 12, 2008

Ms. Zoe Lofgren of California (for herself and Mr. Delahunt) submitted 
   the following resolution; which was referred to the Committee on 
                            Foreign Affairs

_______________________________________________________________________

                               RESOLUTION


 
 Condemning the dismissal of the Supreme Court in Pakistan and calling 
         for their reinstatement by the Government of Pakistan.

Whereas on March 9, 2007, President Pervez Musharraf of Pakistan suspended the 
        Chief Justice of Pakistan, Iftikhar Muhammad Chaudhry;
Whereas this removal triggered months of protests by hundreds of Pakistani 
        lawyers;
Whereas on July 20, 2007, the Supreme Court of Pakistan found Chaudhry's removal 
        unconstitutional and reinstated him as Chief Justice;
Whereas following his imposition of emergency rule on November 3, 2007, 
        President Musharraf required Supreme Court justices to take a new oath 
        of office under the Provisional Constitution Order and dismissed seven 
        judges, including the Chief Justice, who refused to take this new oath;
Whereas the principles of constitutional order and the rule of law are 
        prerequisites to any functioning democracy;
Whereas an independent judiciary and free elections are equally vital as 
        fundamental foundations of democracy;
Whereas section 699F(b)(3)(D) of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2008 
        (Public Law 110-161), withholds $50,000,000 of Foreign Military 
        Financing for Pakistan pending the restoration of an independent 
        judiciary; and
Whereas these actions by President Musharraf undermine democratic governance and 
        rule of law in Pakistan and thus reduce the ability of the Government of 
        Pakistan and the Government of the United States to effectively fight 
        against al Qaeda and Taliban terrorists that threaten United States 
        interests in South Asia: Now, therefore, be it
    Resolved, That the United States House of Representatives--
            (1) commends members of the legal profession in Pakistan as 
        well as opposition politicians, human rights activists, and 
        independent journalists for their courageous opposition to the 
        removal of Chief Justice Chaudhry, their principled leadership 
        in defending the Constitution of Pakistan, and promoting the 
        rule of law;
            (2) welcomes public statements from Pakistan's new civilian 
        leaders that they intend to restore all judges dismissed after 
        November 3, 2007, to office; and
            (3) calls on the Government of Pakistan, consistent with 
        section 699F(b)(3)(D) of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 
        2008 (Public Law 110-161), to restore to their positions Chief 
        Justice Iftikhar Muhammad Chaudhry and all Supreme Court and 
        high court justices and other members of the legal profession 
        in Pakistan who were removed from office since the imposition 
        of emergency rule, and to respect the independence of the 
        Pakistani judiciary .
                                 <all>

Share This